EP0366088 - Regenerative braking system for car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 10-go, 22-ban, 6-chome, Minami-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 10-go, 22-ban, 6-chome, Minami-Ohi Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Koji 4-31-8 Sakuradai Nerima-ku Tokyo 176 / JP | 02 /
Shima, Takashi 5-2-14 Togoshi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142 / JP | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/18] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys. SAMSON & PARTNER, Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89119751.9 | 24.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | JP19880271528 | 27.10.1988 Original published format: JP 27152888 | JP19880272750 | 28.10.1988 Original published format: JP 27275088 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366088 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366088 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366088 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/12, B60T1/10 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
B60T1/10 (EP,US);
B60K6/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S188/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Bremssystem mit Energierückgewinnung für ein Fahrzeug | [1994/01] | English: | Regenerative braking system for car | [1990/18] | French: | Système de freinage à récupération d'énergie pour véhicule | [1990/18] |
Former [1990/18] | Bremssystem mit Energierücksgewinnung für ein Fahrezeug | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0075035 (KAPPMEIER UWE H ING GRAD); | [A]US4741410 (TUNMORE FRED [US]); | [A]EP0248178 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) | Examination | FR2332460 | EP0366087 |