EP0355870 - Lead attachment method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 8501 West Higgins Road Chicago Illinois 60631-2887 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 8501 West Higgins Road Chicago, Illinois 60631-2887 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rayburn, Charles C. 1920 Burnt Bridge Road Apt. 221 Lynchburg Virginia 24503 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89119905.1 | 12.11.1984 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19830552891 | 17.11.1983 Original published format: US 552891 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355870 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355870 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355870 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01G13/00, B23K11/20 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
H01G4/232 (EP,US);
B23K11/20 (EP,US);
H01G13/006 (EP,US);
H01G4/224 (EP,US);
H01G4/228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/09] | Title | German: | Drahtverbindungsverfahren | [1990/09] | English: | Lead attachment method | [1990/09] | French: | Méthode de liaison d'un fil | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 17.06.1993 | Appeal received | 24.08.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.09.1993 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84307790.0 / EP0142971 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1026454 (RUEPPEL & CO KONDENSATORENFABR); | [A]GB826286 (TELEPHONE MFG CO LTD); | [A]US3067488 (BENNETT MORELAND P, et al) |