Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] |
05.11.1992 | First examination report | |
25.04.1991 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] |
23.03.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] |
23.03.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] |