EP0425714 - Process for manufacturing an implantable joint prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALPRAECIS BERCHEM + SCHABERG GESELLSCHAFT FÜR METALLFORMGEBUNG MBH Am Dördelmannshof 9-11 D-45886 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [1991/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berchem, Rütger, Dr. Wallneyer Strasse 29 D-4300 Essen / DE | 02 /
Schnitzler, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Fahrenheitstrasse 34 D-4630 Bochum 5 / DE | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Andrejewski, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120072.7 | 28.10.1989 | [1991/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0425714 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30955 (EP,US);
Y10S623/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1991/24] |
Former [1991/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Implantat-Gelenkprothese | [1991/19] | English: | Process for manufacturing an implantable joint prosthesis | [1991/19] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une prothèse d'articulation implantable | [1991/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1989 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 30.10.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, ES, GR, IT, LU, NL | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1990 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0038908 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]); | [A]EP0144574 (WITZEL ULRICH); | [A]FR2577697 (CHALMOND BERNARD [FR]); | [Y]CH663149 (SULZER AG); | [A]EP0255797 (MECRON MED PROD GMBH [DE]); | [YD]DE3740438 (BERCHEM & SCHABERG GMBH [DE]) | [X] - LE NOUVEL AUTOMATISME, Band 30, Nr. 55, Juni 1985, Seiten 50-54, Paris, FR; J.-C. MORETTON et al.: "Problèmes de prothèse, problèmes de CFAO" | [A] - JOURNAL OF BIOMECHANICS, Band 16, Nr. 9, 1983, Seiten 727-742, Pergamon Press Ltd, GB; A. ROHLMANN et al.: "Finite-element-analysis and experimental investigation in a femur with hip endoprosthesis" | [A] - ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE, Band 9, Nr. 3, 1980, Seiten 143-146, MEP Ltd; N.L. SVENSSON et al.: "Finite element analysis of a simulated total hip replacement" | [A] - MEDICAL & BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING & COMPUTING, Band 24, Nr. 3, Mai 1986, Seiten 267-274, IFMBE, London, GB; D. SIU et al.: "Three-dimensional reconstruction of joint surfaces using a microcomputer" |