EP0367177 - Multiplex transmission system for automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mutoh, Makoto 1-6-85, Tsuchisaki-minato-higashi Akita-shi Akita-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsuda, Yutaka 13-27, Sumiredaira Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Himono, Yusaku 2-6-16, Higashi Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Michihira, Osamu 1-9-25, Misuzugaoka-midori Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 05 /
Tokunaga, Toshimichi 1-7-2, Koiue Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/19] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120097.4 | 30.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | JP19880273306 | 31.10.1988 Original published format: JP 27330688 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367177 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367177 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367177 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L1/16, B60R16/02 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
H04L12/407 (EP,US);
H04J3/02 (KR);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/19] | Title | German: | Multiplex-Übertragungssystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1990/19] | English: | Multiplex transmission system for automotive vehicles | [1990/19] | French: | Système de transmission par multiplex pour véhicules automobiles | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 23.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0217571 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al); | [XP]EP0319271 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) |