EP0368131 - Neoglucoproteins, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 35001 Marburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiegand, Herbert, Prof.Dr. Clemens Brentano-Strasse 2 D-3550 Marburg / DE | 02 /
Bosslet, Silke Am Schlag 5 D-3550 Marburg / DE | 03 /
Bosslet, Klaus, Dr. Am Schlag 5 D-3550 Marburg / DE | 04 /
Sedlacek, Klaus, Dr. Sonnenhang 3 D-3550 Marburg / DE | [1996/36] |
Former [1990/20] | 01 /
Wiegand, Herbert, Prof. Dr. Clemens-Brentano-Strasse 2 D-3550 Marburg / DE | ||
02 /
Bosslet, Silke Am Schlag 5 D-3550 Marburg / DE | |||
03 /
Bosslet, Klaus, Dr. Am Schlag 5 D-3550 Marburg / DE | |||
04 /
Sedlacek, Klaus, Dr. Sonnenhang 3 D-3550 Marburg / DE | Representative(s) | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst Gebaüde K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1993/37] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1992/23] | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1990/20] | Klein, Otto, Dr. Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, Patentbüro D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120245.9 | 02.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | DE19883837623 | 05.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3837623 | [1990/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0368131 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0368131 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368131 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP);
C07K14/435 (KR);
A61K39/001169 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (EP);
G01N33/532 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1990/20] | C07K15/14, C07K3/08, A61K39/385, A61K39/00, G01N33/574 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Neoglykoproteine, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1990/20] | English: | Neoglucoproteins, their preparation and use | [1990/20] | French: | Néoglycoprotéines, leur préparation et utilisation | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4557931 (IRIE REIKO F [US], et al) |