EP0372224 - Diffusing pane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kempf, Georg-Ulrich Augustastrasse 8 D-21465 Wentorf / DE | For all designated states Schüler, Egon Motzstrasse 60 D-1000 Berlin 30 / DE | [1990/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1990/24] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120263.2 | 02.11.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | DE19883840632 | 02.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3840632 | [1990/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372224 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372224 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/02, F21V3/04 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
G02B5/0236 (EP,US);
F21V5/00 (EP,US);
F21V9/00 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (EP);
G02B5/0278 (EP);
G02B5/0294 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Streuscheibe | [1990/24] | English: | Diffusing pane | [1990/24] | French: | Verre diffusant | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 16.11.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2950124 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [X]US4165153 (LAND EDWIN H); | [A]DE2948439 (GEN ELECTRIC) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [XP] - APPLIED OPTICS |