EP0367284 - Reconfigurable output port [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | ||
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hillen, Kenneth K. 18445, S.W. Lapaz Court Aloha Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
Shaver, Christopher D. 7040 S.W. Elmhurst Tigard Oregon 97223 / US | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120392.9 | 03.11.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | US19880267477 | 04.11.1988 Original published format: US 267477 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367284 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367284 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/12 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/19] | Title | German: | Rekonfigurierbares Ausgangstor | [1990/19] | English: | Reconfigurable output port | [1990/19] | French: | Porte de sortie reconfigurable | [1990/19] | File destroyed: | 12.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/06] | 10.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0285390 | [Y] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 54, no. 622, February 1982pages 56-65; D.E. SMITH: "New high performance one chip microcomputer" | [A] - IEEE ELECTRO, vol. 7, May 1982, pages 13/21-6; C. YAGER et al.: "High integration LSI for low cost asynchronous communications" |