EP0368209 - A process for immobilizing an enzyme on an electrode surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karube, Isao 2467-11, Arima Miyamae-ku Kawasakishi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
McNeil, Vincent M. 43 Harrison Street Somerville, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
Murakami, Toru c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Pätzold, Herbert Pasinger Strasse 6 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing. Steubstrasse 10 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | ||
Former [1990/20] | Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing. Steubstrasse 10 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120516.3 | 06.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | JP19880282721 | 08.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28272188 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0368209 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368209 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/40 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
C12Q1/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Immobilisierung eines Enzyms auf einer Elektrodenoberfläche | [1990/20] | English: | A process for immobilizing an enzyme on an electrode surface | [1990/20] | French: | Procédé d'immobilisation d'un enzyme sur la surface d'une électrode | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.02.1994 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0304494 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, no. 15, 1st August 1988, pages 1019-1020, London, GB; C. IWAKURA et al.: "Simultaneous immobilization of glucose oxidase and a mediator in conducting polymer films" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, 1988, page 410, abstract no. 225991t, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. IKARIYAMA et al: "High performance micro-enzyme sensor using platinized microelectrode", & BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN. 1988, 61(10), 3525-30 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, 1988, page 296, abstract no. 18602f, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. IKARIYAMA et al: "Micro-enzyme electrode prepared on platinized platinum", & ANAL. LETT. 1987, 20(9), 1407-16 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, 1986, abstract no. 183096p, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. UMAN et al.: "Protein-modified electrodes. The glucose oxidase/polypyrrole system" | Examination | - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, no. 15, 01 August 1988, London (GB); C. IWAKURA et al., pp. 1019-1020# | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, 1986, Columbus,OH (US); M. UMAN et al., no. 183095p# |