EP0368224 - Streptomycete lysozyme gene, method for its isolation and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marquardt, Rüdiger, Dr. Günthersburgallee 69 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 60 / DE | 02 /
Bräu, Barbara, Dr. Johannesallee 8 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | 03 /
Wöhner, Gerhard, Dr. Mühlenkampstrasse 77 D-3050 Wunstorf / DE | 04 /
Präve, Paul, Prof. Dr. Kronberger Weg 7 D-6231 Sulzbach (Taunus) / DE | 05 /
Schlingmann, Merten, Prof. Dr. Schneidhainer Strasse 32a D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 06 /
Pühler, Alfred, Prof. Dr. Am Waldschlösschen 2 D-4800 Bielefeld / DE | 07 /
Birr, Elli Wellensiek 90 D-4800 Bielefeld / DE | 08 /
Wohlleben, Wolfgang, Dr. Menzelstrasse 1 D-4800 Bielefeld / DE | 09 /
Aufderheide, Karin Johanniskirchplatz 1a D-4800 Bielefeld / DE | 10 /
Schneider, Thomas Kösterkamp 14 D-4800 Bielefeld / DE | [1990/20] | Application number, filing date | 89120551.0 | 07.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | DE19883838107 | 10.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3838107 | DE19893908766 | 17.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3908766 | [1990/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0368224 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0368224 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/56, C12N15/76, C12N1/21, C12N9/36, C12Q1/68, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:465) | [1990/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/76 (EP);
C12N9/2462 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Lysozymgen aus Streptomyceten, Verfahren zu seiner Gewinnung und seine Verwendung | [1990/20] | English: | Streptomycete lysozyme gene, method for its isolation and its use | [1990/20] | French: | Gène pour lysozyme de streptomycetes, méthode d'isolement et son utilisation | [1990/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/31] | Request for further processing for: | 07.08.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]ES545689 ; | [YD]DE3701835 ; | [Y]GB2182673 ; | [Y]EP0155189 | [Y] - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., Band 47, Nr. 7, 1983, Seiten 1501-1508; S. KAWATA et al.: "Characterization of two N-acetylmuramidases from Streptomyces globisporus 1829" | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 106, Nr. 23, Juni 1987, Seite 207, Zusammenfassung Nr. 190368d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & ES-A-545 689 (CONS. SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS) 01-05-1986, & ES545689 A 00000000 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 110, Nr. 23, 5. Juni 1989, Seite 587, Zusammenfassung nr. 210901k, Columbus, Ohio, US; E. BIRR et al.: "Isolation and complementation of mutants of Streptomyces coelicolor "Mueller" DSM3030 deficient in lysozyme production", & APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL. 1989, 30(4), 358-63 | [T] - GENE, Band 88, 1990, Seiten 81-86, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (Biomedical Division), Amsterdam, NL; H.S. LICHENSTEIN et al.: "Cloning and nucleotide sequence of the N-acetylmuramidase M1-encoding gene from Streptomyces globisporus" |