EP0368252 - Composite sheet used for reproducible electrostatic image display or record [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Ltd. 5-8, 1-chome Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sagawa, Kouichiro Ajinomoto-Shinmei-Ryo 2-80-3, Shinmei-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kitamura, Nobuyoshi 6-16-20 Onodai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Masako 6-24-12-308 Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Koji 806-40 Kamishirane-cho Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120622.9 | 07.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | JP19880282977 | 09.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28297788 | JP19880326463 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32646388 | JP19880326464 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32646488 | JP19880326465 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32646588 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0368252 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0368252 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368252 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/02, G03G5/14, G03G5/10 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
G03G5/102 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/20 (KR);
C08K7/04 (KR);
C08K9/02 (KR);
G03G5/0202 (EP,KR,US);
G03G5/144 (EP,KR,US);
H01B5/14 (KR);
C08K2201/001 (KR);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31924 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/20] | Title | German: | Blatt mit Kompositstruktur, das zur Wiedergabe oder Aufzeichnung reproduzierbarer elektrostatischer Bilder verwendet wird | [1995/31] | English: | Composite sheet used for reproducible electrostatic image display or record | [1990/20] | French: | Feuille à plusieures couches utilisée pour l'affichage ou l'enregistrement d'images électrostatiques reproductibles | [1990/20] |
Former [1990/20] | Zusammengesetztes Blatt, benutzt für die Auszeichnung oder Aufzeichnung reproduzierbarer elektrostatischer Bilder | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.08.1995 | DE | 03.11.1995 | GB | 07.11.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/47] | DE | 03.11.1995 | |
GB | 07.11.1995 | ||
FR | 29.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/19] | DE | 03.11.1995 | |
FR | 29.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | DE | 03.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61233748 ; | [A]JP59097151 ; | [A]JP58223152 ; | [A]JP61204641 ; | [A]US3493369 (BUSCH THOMAS WILLIAM, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 72 (P-554)(2519) 05 March 1987; & JP-A-61 233 748 (TORAY IND. INC.) 18 October 1986, & JP61233748 A 19861018 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 214 (P-304)(1651) 29 September 1984; & JP-A-59 097 151 (CANON K.K.) 04 June 1984, & JP59097151 A 19840604 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 79 (P-267)(1516) 11 April 1984; & JP-A-58 223 152 (RICOH K.K.) 24 December 1983, & JP58223152 A 19831224 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 35 (P-542)(2482) 03 February 1987; & JP-A-61 204 641 (CANON INC.) 10 September 1986, & JP61204641 A 19860910 |