EP0368274 - Structural material and its application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON ZEON CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8323 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states NIPPON ZEON CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shoji 4135, Akuwa-cho Seya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamato, Motoyuki Ooiso Koma Haitsu 2-232 2-21, Koma Ooiso-cho Naka-gun Kanagawa / JP | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1990/20] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120688.0 | 08.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | JP19880285296 | 11.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28529688 | JP19890053016 | 07.03.1989 Original published format: JP 5301689 | JP19890146593 | 12.06.1989 Original published format: JP 14659389 | JP19890150292 | 13.06.1989 Original published format: JP 15029289 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0368274 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0368274 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C61/06, B29C67/14 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
B29C65/66 (EP);
B29C61/0616 (EP);
B29C63/0034 (EP);
B29C65/5021 (EP);
B29C65/5071 (EP);
B29C65/5085 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/1142 (EP);
B29C66/135 (EP);
B29C66/43 (EP);
B29C66/5221 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/7394 (EP);
B29C65/4815 (EP);
B29C65/4835 (EP);
B29C65/5028 (EP);
B29C66/12441 (EP);
B29C66/5229 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29C66/72143 (EP);
B29C66/73117 (EP);
B29C66/73151 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/003 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2063/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Konstruktionsmaterial und seine Anwendung | [1990/20] | English: | Structural material and its application | [1990/20] | French: | Matériau de construction et son application | [1990/20] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/31] | 15.03.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63130653 ; | [X]JP60028433 ; | [XD]JP59053528 ; | [XD]EP0105775 ; | [X]CH423209 ; | [X]US4193899 ; | [X]US4637944 ; | [A]EP0058091 ; | [A]EP0061143 ; | [A]US3984516 | [X] - DERWENT PUBLICATIONS - WPIL, AN=88-193713 [28], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-63 130 653 (NIPPON ZEON) 02-06-1988, & JP63130653 A 00000000 | [X] - DERWENT PUBLICATION - WPIL, AN=85-076960 [13], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-60 028 433 (NIPPON ZEON) 13-02-1985, & JP60028433 A 00000000 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 009, no. 145 (C-232), 6th July 1984; & JP-A-59 053 528 (NIPPON ZEON) 28-03-1984, & JP59053528 A 00000000 |