EP0375899 - Digitally controlled lathe with a sliding headstock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gildemeister AG Morsestrasse 1 D-33689 Bielefeld / DE | [1990/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlie, Frithjof Böckerstrasse 8 D-3000 Hannover 51 / DE | [1990/27] | Application number, filing date | 89120830.8 | 10.11.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | DE19883843795 | 24.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843795 | [1990/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375899 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375899 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23B3/06 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
B23Q1/01 (EP);
B23B3/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/27] | Title | German: | Numerisch gesteuerte Drehmaschine mit verschieblichem Spindelkasten | [1990/27] | English: | Digitally controlled lathe with a sliding headstock | [1990/27] | French: | Tour à commande numérique avec poupée déplaçable | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2706178 ; | [Y]FR1157956 |