EP0370335 - Cigarette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawrence, Brian Michael 110 Staffordshire Court Winston-Salem North Carolina 27104 / US | 02 /
Moates, Robert Franklin 717 Lankashire Road Winston-Salem North Carolina 27106 / US | 03 /
Perfetti, Thomas Albert 2116 New Castle Drive Winston-Salem North Carolina 27103 / US | 04 /
Pogrow, Renee Marie 6233 Frye Bridge Road Clemmons North Carolina 27012 / US | 05 /
Powell, Robert Henry 251 North Bunker Hill Road Colfax North Carolina 27235 / US | 06 /
Redding, Jerry Wayne Route 12 Box 2615 Lexington North Carolina 27292 / US | 07 /
Stewart, Cynthia Ann 10 South Vance Street Lexington North Carolina 27292 / US | 08 /
Womble, Karen Maria 5374 Heathcote Drive Winston-Salem North Carolina 27104 / US | 09 /
Wong, Milly Mee Lee 3841 Tangle Lane Winston-Salem North Carolina 27106 / US | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120867.0 | 10.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | US19880276161 | 23.11.1988 Original published format: US 276161 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370335 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370335 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/42 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
A24B15/14 (EP,US);
A24B15/301 (EP,US);
A24B15/42 (EP,US);
A24D1/00 (EP,US);
A24D1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/22] | Title | German: | Zigarette | [1990/22] | English: | Cigarette | [1990/22] | French: | Cigarette | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 15.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3861401 (BRISKIN THEODORE S, et al); | [Y]FR2276789 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP0283672 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]); | [Y]EP0290911 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) |