Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0370358
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
13.09.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] |
09.02.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
31.01.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] |
25.11.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |
18.02.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] |
07.05.1992 |
First examination report |
|
10.08.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] |
20.07.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] |
13.04.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] |