EP0370358 - Process for anti-icing and de-icing traffic areas, and device for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ING. ALFRED SCHMIDT GMBH Postfach 1240 79830 St Blasien / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states ING. ALFRED SCHMIDT GMBH Postfach 1240 D-79830 St Blasien / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prieur-Blanc, Serge 242 Rue Bayard F-38140 Rives-sur-Fures / FR | 02 /
Chopin, Francois 27 Avenue d'Alsace F-06000 Nice / FR | 03 /
Hueber, Claude Villa Le Miron Le Trincon F-38430 Saint Jean-de-Moirans / FR | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger & Partner Postfach 16 55 D-82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121028.8 | 13.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | DE19883838445 | 12.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3838445 | [1990/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370358 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370358 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0370358 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
C09K3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verhindern der Eisbildung und zum Auftauen vorhandenen Eises auf Verkehrsflächen sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1990/22] | English: | Process for anti-icing and de-icing traffic areas, and device for carrying out this process | [1990/22] | French: | Procédé pour empêcher la formation de glace ou déglacer les surfaces de roulement et dispositif de mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1990/22] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.04.1994 | IT | 06.04.1994 | NL | 06.04.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 06.04.1994 | |
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1996/44] | GB | 06.04.1994 | |
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | GB | 06.04.1994 | |
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | GB | 06.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | FR258491 [ ]; | DE1229783 [ ] (KALI FORSCHUNGSINSTITUT); | DE1658418 [ ] (VYZK USTAV ANORGAN CHEM); | FR2059301 [ ] (SOLVAY); | FR2130772 [ ] (MIDI SALINS SALINES EST) | Examination | FR2258491 |