EP0369423 - Resilient floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osterwald Sportboden GmbH Industriestrasse 31089 Duingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states Osterwald Sportboden GmbH Industriestrasse D-31089 Duingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Bruno Unter den Eichen 6 D-3216 Salzhemmendorf 4 / DE | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/21] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121133.6 | 15.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | DE19883838712 | 15.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3838712 | [1990/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369423 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369423 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/22 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
E04F15/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [1990/21] | Title | German: | Schwingboden | [1990/21] | English: | Resilient floor | [1990/21] | French: | Plancher élastique | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.1993
Hamberger Industriewerke GmbH Postfach 10 03 53 D-83003 Rosenheim / DE Opponent's representative Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.1993
Hamberger Industriewerke GmbH Postfach 10 03 53 D-83003 Rosenheim / DE Opponent's representative Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1994/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.12.1993
Hamberger Industriewerke GmbH Postfach 10 03 53 D-83003 Rosenheim / DE Opponent's representative KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | 15.12.1993 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 20.12.1993 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.03.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.09.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.03.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/49] | CH | 03.03.1993 | |
LI | 03.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2263895 (VALEUR LARSEN BJORN); | [AD]DE1255900 (IND F P HAMBERGER G M B H); | [AD]DE1907190 (HOESS KLAUS DIETER); | [YD]DE8329011U ; | [Y]DE3239670 (HOESS KLAUS DIETER ALBERT DIPL) |