EP0375918 - Plastic strap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1993 [1993/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | [1992/44] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cognard, Jacques Chemin de Serroue 17 CH-2006 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
Ganguillet, Claude Avenue des Alpes 22 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | de Montmollin, Henri, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 89121369.6 | 18.11.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | FR19880015647 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: FR 8815647 | [1990/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375918 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375918 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/00 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
A44C5/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI [1990/27] | Title | German: | Kunststoffarmband | [1990/27] | English: | Plastic strap | [1990/27] | French: | Bracelet en matière plastique | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH314076 (VERON PIERRE [FR]); | [A]CH509054 (KAUFMANN WILHELM [CH]); | [A]US3939027 (OHYA SHOGO, et al); | [A]GB1579433 (DUNLOP LTD); | [A]AT364557B (WESIAK HUBERT [AT]); | [A]EP0198279 (EBAUCHESFABRIK ETA AG [CH]) |