EP0371374 - Thixotropic gel, and its use as a filler for a fibre-optical cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.B. Fuller GmbH Postfach 20 50 D-21310 Lüneburg / DE | [1990/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poppe, Wilfried Stiepelserstrasse 18 D-3124 Bleckede/Alt Garge / DE | 02 /
Lubczyk, Frank Dorfstrasse 3 D-2121 Wendisch Evern / DE | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121500.6 | 21.11.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | DE19883839596 | 24.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3839596 | [1990/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0371374 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/22, G02B6/44, C08K3/36 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
H01B3/22 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP);
G02B6/44384 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L23/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/23] | Title | German: | Thixotropes Gel und dessen Verwendung als Füllmasse für Lichtwellenleiterkabel | [1990/23] | English: | Thixotropic gel, and its use as a filler for a fibre-optical cable | [1990/23] | French: | Gel thixotrope et son utilisation comme charge pour câble de fibre optique | [1990/23] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0004425 (UNIROYAL INC [US]); | [Y]EP0029198 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]FR2607311 (BP CHIMIE SA [FR]) |