EP0373392 - Portable hydraulic crane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.1994 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEIN-WERNER CORPORATION 1005 Perkins Avenue Waukesha Wisconsin 53186 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states HEIN-WERNER CORPORATION 1005 Perkins Avenue Waukesha Wisconsin 53186 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballard, James G. 1107 Green Meadow Drive Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121557.6 | 21.11.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | US19880281490 | 08.12.1988 Original published format: US 281490 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0373392 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/48 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
B66C23/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Tragbarer hydraulischer Kran | [1990/25] | English: | Portable hydraulic crane | [1990/25] | French: | Grue hydraulique portable | [1990/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/50] | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3367512 ; | [Y]US4190233 ; | [X]US4669703 ; | [A]US4749324 ; | [A]US4508233 ; | [A]US2939590 ; | [A]FR59878E ; | [A]US3825132 ; | [A]DE2003769 |