Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5076448 | 31.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US28149088 | 08.12.1988 | US57326390 | 24.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0373392 | Global Dossier | 20.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28149088 | 08.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1324989 | 07.12.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | US28149088 | 08.12.1988 |