EP0370496 - Device for supplying plastic material for denture base and flask with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGOKU SHIKEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-6, Kogokita 3-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states CHUGOKU SHIKEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-6, Kogokita 3-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Masato 4-6, Kogokita 3-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121585.7 | 22.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | JP19880296798 | 24.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29679888 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370496 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370496 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0370496 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/57, B29C45/73, A61C13/16 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
A61C13/14 (KR);
A61C13/16 (EP);
B29C45/57 (KR);
B29C45/572 (EP);
B29C45/73 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1990/22] | Title | German: | Kunststoffzuführvorrichtung für Zahnstützvorrichtung und damit versehener Formkosten | [1990/22] | English: | Device for supplying plastic material for denture base and flask with the same | [1990/22] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation de matière plastique pour support dentaire et châssis de moulage le comportant | [1990/22] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3322343 (NOLDEN AXEL); | [AD]GB2174007 (MOLTEN CORP, et al); | [X]DE849476 (STRATTNER FRANZ); | [X]US1875660 (RODIN WILLIAM F, et al) | [A] - PLASTICS ENGINEERING, vol. 35, no. 6, June 1979, pages 41-44, Greenwich, GB; W.G. HALSTEAD et al.: "Processing- Vary the volume, control the shrinkage" |