EP0375956 - Disc brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motion Control Industries, Inc. Gillis Avenue Ridgway, Pennsylvania 15853 / US | [1991/41] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redenbarger, Philip Dale R.R.2 Centerpoint Indiana 47840 / US | 02 /
Megginson, George William 407 West 3rd Street, N. Thomasville Alabama 36784 / US | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1990/27] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121812.5 | 25.11.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | US19880277729 | 30.11.1988 Original published format: US 277729 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375956 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/54, F16D55/224 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
F16D55/227 (EP,US);
F16D55/22655 (EP,US);
F16D65/54 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0029 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Scheibenbremse | [1990/27] | English: | Disc brake | [1990/27] | French: | Frein à disque | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 13.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/12] | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1507933 (DAYTON STEEL FOUNDRY CO); | [Y]GB1255079 (DAYTON STEEL FOUNDRY CO [US]); | [Y]GB1524007 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND); | [Y]US4193481 (WUNDERLICH LANGLEY H [US]); | [A]GB2099524 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED); | [A]DE3120685 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [A]DE3443550 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [A]WO8703349 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) |