EP0364000 - A special purpose processor for off-loading many operating system functions in a large data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION P.O. Box 500 Blue Bell, PA 19424-0001 / US | [1990/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jennings, Andrew Thomas 200 North Deerwood Drive West Chester Pennsylvania 19382 / US | 02 /
Keller, John Allen 12 Valley Green Drive Coatesville Pennsylvania 19320 / US | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Carmichael, David Andrew Halliday, et al Baron Warren Redfern Lynn House Ivy Arch Road Worthing West Sussex BN14 8BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Carmichael, David Andrew Halliday, et al G.F. REDFERN & CO., Redfern House 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB | ||
Former [1990/16] | Kirby, Harold Douglas Benson G.F. Redfern & Company Marlborough Lodge 14 Farncombe Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 2BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89121835.6 | 26.09.1986 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | US19850787781 | 15.10.1985 Original published format: US 787781 | US19850787668 | 15.10.1985 Original published format: US 787668 | US19850787669 | 15.10.1985 Original published format: US 787669 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364000 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364000 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364000 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
G06F9/4881 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/34] |
Former [1990/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Sonderzweckprozessor zur Übernahme vieler Betriebssystemfunktionen in einem grossen Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1990/16] | English: | A special purpose processor for off-loading many operating system functions in a large data processing system | [1990/16] | French: | Processeur à usage spécial se chargeant de plusieurs fonctions du système d'exploitation dans un grand système de traitement de données | [1990/16] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 27.12.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, IT, LU | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86906170.5 / EP0243402 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | SE | 28.02.1995 | [1996/03] |
Former [1995/41] | BE | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4084228 (DUFOND PATRICK, et al); | [A]EP0021146 (IBM [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 10, March 1973, pages 3141-3143, New York, US; T.R. EDEL: "I/O event synchronization with an express dispatch/descend mechanism" | [A] - PER BRINCH HANSEN: "Operating System Principles", Prentice-Hall, Englewood Cliffs, New Jersey, 1973, chapter 3, section 3.4 | by applicant | US4084228 | US3546677 | US3548384 |