Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0372347 | Global Dossier | 03.07.1991 | A3 | EP0372347 | 13.06.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US28222888 | 08.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02219859 | 03.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US28222888 | 08.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4892907 | 09.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US28222888 | 08.12.1988 |