EP0372362 - Laser scalpel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRISTALLTECHNOLOGIE ANDREAS MAIER GmbH Stegwiesen 2 D-88477 Schwendi-Hörenhausen / DE | [1995/05] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states HARTMETALLWERKZEUGFABRIK ANDREAS MAIER GMBH + CO. KG Stegwiesen 2 D-88477 Schwendi / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ackermann, Lothar, Dr. Lange Strasse 15b D-7918 Illertissen / DE | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | König, Beate Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | König, Beate, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwältin European Patent Attorney Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/22] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1990/24] | Hutzelmann, Gerhard Duracher Strasse 22 D-87437 Kempten / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121958.6 | 28.11.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | DE19883840609 | 02.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3840609 | [1990/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372362 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372362 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372362 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/36 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
A61B18/22 (EP,US);
A61B17/32093 (US);
A61B17/3211 (US);
A61B2018/00023 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/24] | Title | German: | Laserskalpell | [1990/24] | English: | Laser scalpel | [1990/24] | French: | Scalpel à laser | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.1993 | 30.11.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.1994 | 30.11.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.06.1995 | AT | 28.11.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 28.06.1995 | |
AT | 28.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 28.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0227258 (MICRA LTD [GB]); | [A]DE3730278 (HOSHINO MASAHIKO [JP]); | [A]EP0292622 (SURGICAL LASER TECH [US]) |