blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0380776

EP0380776 - Ring spinning or twisting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.12.1991
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.1992 [1992/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zinser Textilmaschinen GmbH
Hans-Zinser-Strasse
D-73061 Ebersbach/Fils / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/32]For all designated states
Zinser Textilmaschinen GmbH
Hans-Zinser-Strasse Postfach 1480
D-73058 Ebersbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bernauer, Benno
Schwarzwaldstrasse 7
D-7868 Todtnau / DE
02 / Schettkat, Volker
Galgenbergweg 18
D-7924 Steinheim / DE
[1990/32]
Application number, filing date89122045.129.11.1989
[1990/32]
Priority number, dateDE1989390253028.01.1989         Original published format: DE 3902530
[1990/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0380776
Date:08.08.1990
Language:DE
[1990/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0380776
Date:05.12.1990
Language:DE
[1990/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.1990
ClassificationIPC:D01H1/36
[1990/32]
CPC:
D01H1/36 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1990/32]
TitleGerman:Ringspinn- oder Zwirnmaschine[1990/32]
English:Ring spinning or twisting machine[1990/32]
French:Métier à filer à anneaux ou métier à retordre à anneaux[1990/32]
File destroyed:12.03.1999
Examination procedure06.06.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/08]
16.09.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1992/08]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3336040
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.