EP0372374 - Arrangement for window fastening in a flexible folding top and procedure for manufacturing a separable window connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEHLER VARIO SYSTEM GmbH Edelzeller Strasse 53 D-36043 Fulda / DE | [1990/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolz, Josef Witzelstrasse d D-6400 Fulda / DE | 02 /
Gössmann, Rainer Ruthenweg 11 D-6404 Neuhof/Giesel / DE | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122049.3 | 29.11.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | DE19883841035 | 06.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3841035 | [1990/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0372374 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372374 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/18 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
B60J1/1815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Fensterbefestigung in einem flexiblen Verdeck und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer lösbaren Fensterverbindung | [1990/24] | English: | Arrangement for window fastening in a flexible folding top and procedure for manufacturing a separable window connection | [1990/24] | French: | Disposition à fixation de fenêtre dans une capote flexible et procédure pour la production d'une jonction de fenêtre détachable | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 16.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3388945 (KEVELIN BRUCE E, et al); | [A]DE1604520 (FORD MOTOR CO) |