EP0373424 - Antiperspirant compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raleigh, William John 10 Glen Street Rensselaer New York 12144 / US | 02 /
Thimineur, Raymond Joseph 162 Willow Lane Scotia New York 12302 / US | 03 /
Zotto, Anthony Arthur 138 Hidley Road Troy New York 12180 / US | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/25] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1991/40] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr. Finstertal 12 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
Former [1990/25] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122109.5 | 30.11.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | US19880282655 | 12.12.1988 Original published format: US 282655 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373424 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373424 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373424 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/32 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/89 (KR);
A61K8/28 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/894 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Schweisshemmendes Mittel | [1990/25] | English: | Antiperspirant compositions | [1990/25] | French: | Compositions antitranspirantes | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 16.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4268499 (KEIL JOSEPH W) | [X] - COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, vol. 96, no. 8, August 1981, pages 55-57, Allured Publishing Corp., Oakpark, Illinois, US; A.J. DiSAPIO et al.: "New silicone emulsifier technology" |