EP0376000 - Reactor for exothermic heterogeneous catalytic synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMMONIA CASALE S.A. Via della Posta 4 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | For all designated states Zardi, Umberto Via Lucino 57 CH-6932 Breganzona (Ti) / CH | [1990/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zardi, Umberto Via Lucino 57 CH-6932 Breganzona / CH | 02 /
Pagani, Giorgio Salita dei Frati 13 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Incollingo, Italo AMMONIA CASALE S.A. Via della Posta 4 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Incollingo, Italo AMMONIA CASALE S.A. Via della Posta 4 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 89122322.4 | 04.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | CH19880004551 | 09.12.1988 Original published format: CH 455188 | [1990/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376000 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376000 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/04, C01C1/04, C07C29/15 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C01C1/0423 (EP);
B01J8/0415 (EP);
B01J8/0496 (EP);
C07C29/152 (EP);
B01J2208/00194 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/152, C07C31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | Reaktor für die exotherme heterogene katalytische Synthese | [1990/27] | English: | Reactor for exothermic heterogeneous catalytic synthesis | [1990/27] | French: | Réacteur pour la synthèse hétérogène, exothermique et catalytique | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 20.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.10.1991 | GR | 30.10.1991 | NL | 30.10.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1992/29] | AT | 30.10.1991 | |
NL | 30.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | NL | 30.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4755362 (ZARDI UMBERTO [CH]); | [AP]EP0297474 (AMMONIA CASALE SA [CH], et al); | [AP]EP0332757 (AMMONIA CASALE SA [CH], et al) |