EP0374582 - Sun visor for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Happich GmbH Postfach 10 02 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | [1990/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viertel, Lothar Lilienstrasse 4 D-6636 Altforweiler / DE | 02 /
Kaiser, Peter Sellscheid 42 D-5632 Wermelskirchen / DE | 03 /
Welter, Patrick Chemin de Romains F-57730 La Chambre / FR | [1990/26] | Application number, filing date | 89122441.2 | 05.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883842705 | 19.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842705 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374582 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374582 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374582 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/02 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B60J3/02 (KR);
B60J3/0234 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Sonnenblende für Fahrzeuge | [1990/26] | English: | Sun visor for vehicles | [1990/26] | French: | Pare-soleil pour véhicules | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4248473 (HILDEBRAND OTTO J); | [AD]EP0231440 ; | [A]GB567958 (NORA BRIDGET HAYES) |