EP0373489 - Concurrent addition process for preparing high purity epoxy resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liao, Zeng-Kun 103 Bougainvillea Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | 02 /
Wang, Chun S. 109 Rose Trail Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1990/25] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122449.5 | 05.12.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | US19880283400 | 12.12.1988 Original published format: US 283400 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373489 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373489 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373489 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0373489 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/02 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
C08G59/02 (EP);
C08G59/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/25] | Title | German: | Gleichzeitiges Zugabeverfahren für die Herstellung von sehr reinen Epoxydharzen | [1990/25] | English: | Concurrent addition process for preparing high purity epoxy resins | [1990/25] | French: | Procédé d'addition simultanée pour la préparation de résines époxydes extrêmement pures | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1996
26.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Ciba Spezialitätenchemie Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1996
26.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1996
CIBA-GEIGY AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | 04.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.03.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.04.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.10.1999 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.11.1995 | ES | 29.11.1995 | FR | 29.11.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 29.11.1995 | |
ES | 29.11.1995 | ||
FR | 26.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/37] | BE | 29.11.1995 | |
FR | 26.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 29.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60020926 ; | [A]EP0264760 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL, no. 85-065298, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-60 020 926 (MITSUBISHI) 02-02-1985, & JP60020926 A 00000000 |