EP0373492 - Processing unit using truth-valued flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APT INSTRUMENTS CORP. 15-23, Asahi-cho 2-chome Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states APT INSTRUMENTS CORP. 15-23, Asahi-cho 2-chome Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Hongmin c/o APT INSTRUMENTS CORP. 15-23, Asahi-cho 2-chome Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122466.9 | 06.12.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | JP19880307697 | 07.12.1988 Original published format: JP 30769788 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373492 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373492 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373492 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06J1/00, G06G7/60, G06G7/26, G06F7/60 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
G06N5/048 (EP,US);
G06N7/04 (EP,US);
Y10S706/90 (US)
|
Former IPC [1990/25] | G06J1/00, G06G7/60, G06G7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Wahrheitswerteflussverarbeitungseinheit | [1990/25] | English: | Processing unit using truth-valued flow | [1990/25] | French: | Unité de traitement de flux de valeurs de vérité | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 03.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.1995 | BE | 17.05.1995 | CH | 17.05.1995 | ES | 17.05.1995 | GR | 17.05.1995 | LI | 17.05.1995 | NL | 17.05.1995 | SE | 17.08.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
ES | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0268182 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) |