EP0373509 - Scraping device for a floor cleaning tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.1991 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states de Argila Tassis, Angela 29, Bruniquer E-08029 Barcelona / ES | [1990/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Körner, Ekkehard Patentanwalt Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | Körner, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122583.1 | 07.12.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | ES19880003721U | 15.12.1988 Original published format: ES 8803721 U | [1990/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0373509 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/12, A47L13/20, A46B17/08 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
A46B17/08 (EP);
A47L13/12 (EP);
A47L13/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/25] | Title | German: | Abkratzer für eine Bodennreinigungsvorrichtung | [1990/25] | English: | Scraping device for a floor cleaning tool | [1990/25] | French: | Racleur pour instrument de nettoyage du sol | [1990/25] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/33] | 20.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2163979 ; | [X]GB2150015 ; | [A]CH176598 ; | [A]GB774405 ; | [A]FR466418 ; | [A]US3094728 ; | [A]US3084369 |