EP0372567 - Polling communication system with priority control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tezuka, Koji Fujitsu Dai 12 Nakahararyo 339-1, Shimokodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Shinomiya, Tomohiro Coopo Hai Brijji 102 131-4, Imainishimachi Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Amemiya, Shigeo 1-30-3-306, Kaminomiya Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230 / JP | 04 /
Iguchi, Kazuo 2582-8, Imajuku-cho Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241 / JP | 05 /
Soejima, Tetsuo 1-67-6-3, Suwa Tama-shi Tokyo 206 / JP | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122681.3 | 08.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | JP19880310100 | 09.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31010088 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372567 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372567 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372567 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L29/02 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
H04L12/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/24] | Title | German: | Aufrufdatenübertragungssystem mit Vorrangssteuerung | [1990/24] | English: | Polling communication system with priority control | [1990/24] | French: | Système de communication d'interrogation avec commande prioritaire | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4742512 (AKASHI FUMIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US3702008 (GROTH GEORGE STEPHEN); | [A]GB2162722 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]WO8600733 (NCR CO [US]) |