EP0374641 - Method to suppress amplitude variations of two alternating, periodic signals in phase quadrature with a random phase sequence, and circuit arrangement to carry out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweigert, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Uhlandstrasse 4 D-8523 Baiersdorf / DE | [1990/26] | Application number, filing date | 89122722.5 | 08.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883843108 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843108 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374641 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374641 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374641 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/45 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
G05F1/44 (EP);
G05F1/452 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ausregelung von Amplitudenschwankungen zweier um 90o el. phasenverschobener, alternierender, periodischer Signale beliebiger Phasenfolge und Schaltungsanordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1990/26] | English: | Method to suppress amplitude variations of two alternating, periodic signals in phase quadrature with a random phase sequence, and circuit arrangement to carry out the method | [1990/26] | French: | Procédure pour supprimer les variations d'amplitudes de deux signaux alternatifs, périodiques en quadrature avec séquence de phase aléatoire et circuit pour réaliser le procédé | [1995/07] |
Former [1990/26] | Procédure pour supprimer les variations d'amplitutes de deux signaux alternatifs, périodiques en quadrature avec séquence de phase aléatoire et circuit pour réaliser le procédé | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.02.1995 | GB | 15.02.1995 | IT | 15.02.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 15.02.1995 | |
IT | 15.02.1995 | ||
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | GB | 15.02.1995 | |
FR | 13.07.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | FR | 13.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60121808 ; | [A]US3378786 (ANDREA JOHN J); | [A]US3464022 (LOCHEED EDWARD W JR, et al); | [A]US4707840 (NAKAYAMA KENJI [JP]) | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, 16. September 1982, Seiten 133-139; P. BURTON: "Denser CMOS DACs cut hardware, software" | [A] - ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, Band 31, Nr. 2, Januar 1986, Seiten 214-217; M. BILAC: "Program returns D/A input for new gain" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 277 (E-355)[2000], 6 November 1985; & JP - A - 60 121 808 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 29-06-1985, & JP60121808 A 19851106 | Examination | US3705908 | - Der Elektroniker, M.9, 1986 |