EP0380788 - Device for the connectorless power supply and data-linking of portable workshop measuring apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Raimund GRUNDIG E.M.V. Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-8510 Fürth/Bay / DE | [1990/32] | Application number, filing date | 89122745.6 | 09.12.1989 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | DE19893902618 | 30.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3902618 | [1990/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380788 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01F23/00 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
H01F38/14 (EP);
H01F2038/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/32] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur steckerfreien Stromversorgung und Datenverbindung für tragbare Werkstattmessgeräte | [1990/32] | English: | Device for the connectorless power supply and data-linking of portable workshop measuring apparatuses | [1990/32] | French: | Dispositif pour l'alimentation en courant et la liaison de données sans connecteur, destinées à des appareils de mesure portables | [1990/32] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/41] | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2566572 ; | [X]JPS60211811 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 58 (E-386)(2115) 07 März 1986& JP-A-60 211811 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) |