EP0373549 - Amino acid derivatives with enzyme-inhibiting properties, process to synthetise them, composition containing them and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüger, Wolfgang, Dr. Parkstrasse 10 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Urbach, Hansjörg, Dr. Le Lavandoustrasse 41 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Ruppert, Dieter, Dr. Schreyerstrasse 30 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 04 /
Schölkens, Bernward, Dr. Hölderlinstrasse 62 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1990/25] | Application number, filing date | 89122794.4 | 11.12.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | DE19883842067 | 14.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842067 | [1990/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373549 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373549 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373549 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07K5/06, A61K37/64 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07K7/02 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K5/0227 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/25] | C07K5/02, C07K5/06, C07C317/44, C07C323/52, C07C291/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Enzym-hemmende Aminosäurederivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, diese enthaltende Mittel und ihre Verwendung | [1990/25] | English: | Amino acid derivatives with enzyme-inhibiting properties, process to synthetise them, composition containing them and their use | [1990/25] | French: | Dérivés d'acides aminés inhibiteurs d'enzymes, procédé pour les synthétiser, moyens les contenant et leur emploi | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8704349 [ ] (DELLARIA JOSEPH, et al) |