EP0374668 - Fluorescent marking fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.W. Faber - Castell GmbH & Co. Nürnberger Strasse 2 D-90547 Stein / DE | [1990/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stengel, Rudolf Gleimstrasse 17 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1990/26] | Application number, filing date | 89122799.3 | 11.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883842382 | 16.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842382 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374668 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374668 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C09D11/16 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/26] | C09D11/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/26] | Title | German: | Fluoreszierende Markierungsflüssigkeit | [1990/26] | English: | Fluorescent marking fluid | [1990/26] | French: | Liquide de marquage fluorescent | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 15.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/52] | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3529798 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE3207217 (GEHA WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2301582 (PELIKAN WERKE WAGNER GUENTHER [DE]) |