EP0374671 - Use of selected ester oils in drilling fluids, especially for off-shore oil or gas recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. 4100 Clinton Drive Houston, Texas 77020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 4100 Clinton Drive Houston, Texas 77020 / US | |||
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Baroid Drilling Fluids, Inc. 3000 North Sam Houston Parkway East Houston, Texas / US | |||
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Baroid Drilling Fluids, Inc. 3000 North Sam Houston Parkway East Houston, Texas / US | |||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states BAROID LIMITED St. Magnus House Guild Street Aberdeen Scotland AB1 2NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Heinz Goldregenweg 4 D-4019 Monheim / DE | 02 /
Herold, Claus-Peter, Dr. Ostpreussenstrasse 26 D-4020 Mettmann / DE | 03 /
von Tapavicza, Stephan, Dr. Thomas-Mann-Strasse 12 D-4006 Erkrath 2 / DE | 04 /
Grimes, Douglas John 12 Ledborough Lane Beaconsfield HP9 2PZ / GB | 05 /
Braun, Jean-Marc Bernstorffstrasse 34 E D-3100 Celle / DE | 06 /
Smith, Stuart P. T. Creag Ghlaf Drumoak Banchory Kincardineshire / GB | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/16] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1991/05] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122819.9 | 11.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883842659 | 19.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842659 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374671 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374671 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09K7/06 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C09K8/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/16] |
Former [1990/26] | GR | Title | German: | Verwendung ausgewählter Esteröle in Bohrspülungen insbesondere zur off-shore-Erschliessung von Erdöl- bzw. Erdgasvorkommen (l) | [1990/26] | English: | Use of selected ester oils in drilling fluids, especially for off-shore oil or gas recovery | [1990/26] | French: | Utilisation d'huiles d'esters sélectionnées, dans les fluides de forage, en particulier pour l'exploitation off-shore du pétrole ou du gaz | [1990/26] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/17: Verbunden mit 90900103.4/0448579 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 05.03.92 | EPB 1992/17: Consolidated with 90900103.4/0448579 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 05.03.92 | EPB 1992/17: Jointe à la demande no. 90900103.4/0448579 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 05.03.92 | Examination procedure | 25.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.1994
30.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.1994
30.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude c/o Fina Research S.A. Patent Department Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE | 07.03.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.08.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.11.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/43] | Appeal following opposition | 18.12.1996 | Appeal received No. T0015/97 | 20.02.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.03.2000 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 01.03.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 08.11.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.2000 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 24.06.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0009746 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [YD]US4374737 (LARSON DANA E [US], et al); | [Y]US4631136 (JONES III REED W [US]) |