EP0373564 - Device for transforming a laminar fluid flow into drops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rajster, Vojko Ljuba Sercerja 2 YU-61230 Domzale / YU | For all designated states Rajster, Ales Brilejeva 14 YU-61000 Ljubljana / YU | [1990/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Lewald, Dietrich, et al Vonnemann, Kloiber, Lewald, Hübner Belgradstrasse 1 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Lewald, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/33] | Lewald, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pienzenauerstrasse 2 W-8000 München 80 / DE | ||
Former [1990/25] | Lewald, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122846.2 | 11.12.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | YU19880002260 | 14.12.1988 Original published format: YU 226088 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373564 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373564 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373564 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/175 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
A61M5/16877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Umwandlung einer laminaren Strömung in Tropfen | [1990/25] | English: | Device for transforming a laminar fluid flow into drops | [1990/25] | French: | Dispositif pour transformer un écoulement laminaire en gouttes | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 02.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2109384 (RHONE POULENC SA); | [Y]US3398860 (PAUL BATTIG); | [A]CH519658 (MEYRAT & LUISONI [CH]); | [A]FR2227019 (SORENSON RESEARCH CO [US]); | [A]FR2468049 (BRUNEAU LABORATOIRES [FR]); | [A]FR2390174 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [US]) |