EP0377838 - Manufacture of 5-cyanovaleric acid and its esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burke, Patrick Michael 461 Talley Hill Lane Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Sieja, Jams Bernard 2724 Skylark Rod Wilmington Delaware 19808 / US | [1990/29] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122903.1 | 12.12.1989 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | US19880283158 | 12.12.1988 Original published format: US 283158 | [1990/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0377838 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/19, C07C253/30 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
C07C255/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/29] | Title | German: | Herstellung von 5-Cyanvaleriansäure und deren Estern | [1990/29] | English: | Manufacture of 5-cyanovaleric acid and its esters | [1990/29] | French: | Fabrication de l'acide 5-cyanovalérique et de ses esters | [1990/29] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4508660 (SIEJA JAMES B [US]); | [AD]US4060543 (WEITZ HANS-MARTIN, et al); | [AD]GB1497046 (ICI LTD); | [A]US4235744 (HAASE THOMAS A [US], et al) |