EP0377143 - Loudspeaker voice coil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Unterhaltungselektronik (Deutschland) GmbH Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | [1990/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Patrick Bertholdstrasse 6 D-8443 Bogen / DE | [1990/28] | Application number, filing date | 89122992.4 | 13.12.1989 | [1990/28] | Priority number, date | DE19893900038 | 03.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3900038 | [1990/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0377143 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0377143 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/04 | [1990/28] | CPC: |
H04R9/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1990/28] | Title | German: | Lautsprecher-Schwingspule | [1990/28] | English: | Loudspeaker voice coil | [1990/28] | French: | Bobine de haut-parleur | [1990/28] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/40] | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.03.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3711659 ; | [A]FR732653 ; | [A]US2445276 ; | [E]DE3830082 |