EP0373644 - Three-dimensional displacement gauge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOVERNOR OF TOYAMA PREFECTURE YUTAKA NAKAOKI 1-7 Shinsoumagariwa Toyama-shi Toyama-ken / JP | For all designated states KITAMURA MACHINERY CO., LTD. 1870 Toide-Komyoji Takaoka-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states GOVERNOR OF TOYAMA PREFECTURE YUTAKA NAKAOKI 1-7 Shinsoumagariwa Toyama-shi Toyama-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KITAMURA MACHINERY CO., LTD. 1870 Toide-Komyoji Takaoka-shi Toyama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadosaki, Masahiro Ind. Tech. Cen. Toyama Pref., Chuou Res. Inst. 150 Futagamicho, Takaoka-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Tohbo, Kihachiro Ind. Tech. Cen. Toyama Pref., Chuou Res. Inst. 150 Futagamicho, Takaoka-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugimori, Hiroshi Ind. Tech. Cen. Toyama Pref., Chuou Res. Inst. 150 Futagamicho, Takaoka-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 04 /
Taniguchi, Katsuji, c/o Kitamura Machinery Co Ltd 1870 Toide Komyoji Takaoka-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 05 /
Yamada, Shigeru, c/o Kitamura Machinery Co., Ltd. 1870 Toide Komyoji, Takaoka-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Witte, Alexander, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 14 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | ||
Former [1990/25] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Augustenstrasse 7 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123110.2 | 14.12.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | JP19880314853 | 15.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31485388 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0373644 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373644 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
G01B11/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/25] | Title | German: | Dreidimensionales Verschiebungsmessgerät | [1990/25] | English: | Three-dimensional displacement gauge | [1990/25] | French: | Jauge pour déplacement tridimensionnel | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3234471 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES); | [A]WO8806710 (ULBRICH KLAUS [US]); | [A]US4574199 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]); | [A]GB2150282 (SIGMA LTD) |