EP0374762 - Recording apparatus to which recording head is detachably mountable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takayanagi, Yoshiaki 1-19-10-102 Tsunashimahigashi Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Saito, Asao 5-33-11-201 Utsukushigaoka Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Koizumi, Ryoichi Green-haitsu 203, 303 Ohbacho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Ikeda, Hirokazu 2-36-1 Aobadai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123249.8 | 15.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | JP19880316431 | 16.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31643188 | JP19880316432 | 16.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31643288 | JP19880321507 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32150788 | JP19880321508 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32150888 | JP19880321509 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32150988 | JP19890018224 | 28.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1822489 | JP19890080001 | 30.03.1989 Original published format: JP 8000189 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374762 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374762 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374762 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/34 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B41J25/34 (EP,US);
B41J2/005 (KR);
B41J2002/14379 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/26] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung mit abnehmbarem Aufzeichnungskopf | [1990/26] | English: | Recording apparatus to which recording head is detachably mountable | [1990/26] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement avec tête d'enregistrement amovible | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4741634 (NOZAKI MINEO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0255867 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4788861 (LICHTI REINER [DE]); | [A]US3971039 (TAKANO RIKUO, et al); | [A]GB1578031 (ICI LTD); | [A]US4703332 (CROTTI ALESSANDRO [IT], et al); | [A]GB1524024 (NSF CONTROL LTD); | [A]US4269161 (SIMMONS WILLIAM F); | [A]EP0224644 (TECCOR ELECTRONICS INC [US]); | [A]US4778291 (MITSUHASHI SHUJI [JP]) |