EP0374885 - Antiretroviral aryloxy substituted furan ketones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Roger A. 480 Meadowcrest Road Cincinnati Ohio 45231 / US | 02 /
Sunkara, Sai P. 9361 Bluewing Terrace Cincinnati Ohio 45236 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Sgarbi, Renato GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit 34 21040 Gerenzano (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Sgarbi, Renato GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit, 34 I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1990/26] | Macchetta, Francesco Gruppo Lepetit S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department 34, Via Roberto Lepetit I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | Application number, filing date | 89123558.2 | 20.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | US19880287817 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: US 287817 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374885 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374885 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/46, C07D307/58, C07D307/64, A61K31/34 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C07D307/58 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Antiretrovirale aryloxy-substituierte Furanketone | [1990/26] | English: | Antiretroviral aryloxy substituted furan ketones | [1990/26] | French: | Cétones furanniques aryloxy substituées antirétrovirales | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4011334 (PARKER ROGER ALAN); | [A]EP0082005 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [A]EP0150118 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]); | [A]US4644009 (HUANG FU-CHIH [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JP59225135 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 91 (C-277) (1814), 19 April 1985; & JP-A- 59 225135 (SUMITOMO KAGALU KOGYO) 18-12-1984, & JP59225135 A 19850419 |