EP0416171 - Monitor display method in electric vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON YUSOKI CO., LTD No. 1-1, Higashi-Kotari 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states NIPPON YUSOKI CO., LTD No. 1-1, Higashi-Kotari 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Noriaki No. 1485-1 Oogi-cho Ootsu-shi Shiga / JP | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123572.3 | 20.12.1989 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | JP19890228490 | 04.09.1989 Original published format: JP 22849089 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416171 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416171 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/00 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
G07C5/08 (EP);
G09G1/00 (KR);
B66F9/24 (EP);
G01D7/08 (EP);
G01R31/007 (EP);
G09G3/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildschirmdarstellung in elektrischen Fahrzeugen | [1991/11] | English: | Monitor display method in electric vehicle | [1991/11] | French: | Méthode de visualisation de contrôle dans des véhicules électriques | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/18] | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2059654 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [X]US4817418 (ASAMI KEN [JP], et al); | [Y]GB2125578 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]GB2178600 (MECANISMOS AUX IND); | [A]WO8402787 (TOWMOTOR CORP [US]); | [A]US4339801 (HOSAKA AKIO, et al) |