EP0377877 - Smelting device for solid products coming from barrels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEBA OEL Technologie GmbH Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse 45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states VEBA OEL Technologie GmbH Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse D-45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Philippi, Karl-Heinz Lüdemannsweg 2 D-4650 Gelsenkirchen-Buer / DE | [1990/29] | Representative(s) | Lindner, Wolfgang Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse 45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Lindner, Wolfgang, Dr. Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse D-45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123643.2 | 21.12.1989 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | DE19893900696 | 12.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3900696 | [1990/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0377877 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0377877 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0377877 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01J6/00, B67D5/62 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
B67D7/80 (EP,US);
B01J6/005 (EP,US);
Y10S266/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/29] | Title | German: | Aufschmelzanlage für feste Produkte aus Fässern | [1990/29] | English: | Smelting device for solid products coming from barrels | [1990/29] | French: | Dispositif de fusion pour produits solides stockés dans des fûts | [1990/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH430035 (SCHWARZA CHEMIEFASER [DE]); | [A]US4667850 (SCHOLL CHARLES H [US], et al); | [XP]WO8905278 (MAY COATING TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) |