Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0374939 | Global Dossier | 05.04.1995 | B1 | EP0374939 | 31.07.1991 | A3 | EP0374939 | 27.06.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP32324888 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2006467 | 31.10.1995 | C | CA2006467 | 23.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP32324888 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68922078T | 10.08.1995 | T2 | DE68922078D1 | 11.05.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP32324888 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06100696B | 12.12.1994 | B2 | JPH02170104 | 29.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32324888 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5018821 | 28.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32324888 | 23.12.1988 |