EP0376193 - Method of separating ethanol from beverages obtained by fermentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKW Trostberg Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 12 62, Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 D-83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states SKW TROSTBERG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 12 62, Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 D-83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zobel, Rudolf Jahnstrasse 32 D-8221 Tacherting / DE | 02 /
Schütz, Erwin, Dr. Drosselweg 2 D-8223 Trostberg / DE | 03 /
Vollbrecht, Heinz-Rüdiger, Dr. Gräfin-Adelheid-Strasse 8 D-8226 Altenmarkt / DE | 04 /
Faust, Robert Weis-Ferdl-Strasse 29 D-8268 Garching / DE | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123767.9 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | DE19883843908 | 24.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843908 | [1990/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376193 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376193 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/08 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C12H3/00 (EP,US);
Y10S203/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Ethanol aus durch Vergärung erzeugten Getränken | [1990/27] | English: | Method of separating ethanol from beverages obtained by fermentation | [1990/27] | French: | Procédé d'extraction de l'éthanol dans des boissons obtenues par fermentation | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2902067 ; | [XD]DE2912316 (MUELLER ADAM); | [A]EP0245845 (HOLSTEN BRAUEREI AG [DE]) |